skip to content

Babakkor, Mohammed Ahmed Omar

CPSO#: 92537

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Mar 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2014 to 27 Nov 2014
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015