skip to content

Baamer, Ruba Fuad B

CPSO#: 100069

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2013 to 29 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2016 to 29 May 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2016