skip to content

BONGARD, HOWARD Bryan

CPSO#: 24891

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
Building A
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 439-6654
Fax: (416) 439-6655 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Howard Bongard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. BONGARD ( CPSO# 24891 )

Business Address:
104 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 439-6654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD BRYAN BONGARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONGARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2018

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 13, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)