skip to content

Wagg, Brian Douglas

CPSO#: 29190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
1112 St. Andrew's Dr.
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-549-6980 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.D. Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 6 2014
Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wagg ( CPSO# 29190 )
Dr. G. Mathai ( CPSO# 30723 )
Dr. S. George ( CPSO# 30797 )
Dr. I. Wagg ( CPSO# 90903 )
Dr. A. Mathai ( CPSO# 95206 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS WAGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAGG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977