skip to content

Thomson, Benjamin Kervin Alan

CPSO#: 92006

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 508-5911
Fax: (905) 508-2972 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Thomson ( CPSO# 92006 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Burr 03-038
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Ambulatory Clinics for Home Hemodialysis
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (226) 678-7067

Business Address:
136 English Oak Dr
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4G4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN KERVIN ALAN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
EL - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011