skip to content

Shuckett, Bruce Martin

CPSO#: 33666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1815 ironstone manor ste 15b
Pickering ON  L1W3W9
Canada
Phone: 9058311800
Fax: 9058311806
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Bruce Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 284-1697

Business Address:
Scarborough Radiologists
G03-3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRUCE MARTIN SHUCKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUCKETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989