skip to content

Shah, Bharatkumar Kanaiyalal

CPSO#: 51623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2780 Jane Street
Suite 206
Downsview ON  M3N 2J2
Phone: (416) 743-3419 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 6
1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 794-7979
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. B. and S. Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shah ( CPSO# 95767 )
Dr. B. Shah ( CPSO# 51623 )
Dr. S. Shah ( CPSO# 33758 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
2780 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 743-3419

Business Address:
6 - 1975 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 794-7979


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHARATKUMAR KANAIYALAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1984
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.