skip to content

Rochwerg, Bram Noah

CPSO#: 91001

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St, Hamilton, ON
L8V 1C3
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-515-2121 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Rochwerg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Loewith ( CPSO# 91144 )
Dr. B. Rochwerg ( CPSO# 91001 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRAM NOAH ROCHWERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHWERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.