skip to content

Ritsma, Benjamin Ryan

CPSO#: 93713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department Of Physical Medicine
And Rehabilitation
752 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ritsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ritsma ( CPSO# 92889 )
Dr. B. Ritsma ( CPSO# 93713 )

Business Address:
Student Wellness Services
Queens University - LaSalle Building
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
752 King Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RYAN RITSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016