skip to content

Neu, Bernd Rainer

CPSO#: 29437

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bernd Neu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Management Ltd 1 High Meadow Pl North York ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 647-933-2904 email: [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019