skip to content

Kirsh, Brian Sheldon

CPSO#: 31826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 270
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: 437-244-2345
Fax: (416) 603-3208 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brian S. Kirsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kirsh ( CPSO# 31826 )

Business Address:
Suite 270
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 922-8429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN SHELDON KIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2009

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2008
Summary:

 On November 18, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kirsh to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.   The Committee ordered the following:
 

1.	That 
 Dr. Kirsh appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on the 
 register.  

2.	Directs the Registrar to impose the following term, condition and limitation on 
 Dr. Kirsh(s certificate of registration:1 

(a) 	Dr. Kirsh shall enroll in and successfully 
 complete, at his own expense, the College course (Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the 
 Risks Inherent in the DoctorPatient Relationship(.  Upon proof of completion this term will be 
 removed from Dr. Kirsh(s certificate of registration.  

3. 	That Dr. Kirsh pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $3,650.00.  

4.	Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in 
 the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 18, 2008