skip to content

Kachoei, Babak Ataei

CPSO#: 86426

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Suite 360
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Canada
Phone: 289-366-4565
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kachoei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kachoei ( CPSO# 86426 )

Business Address:
Suite 360
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: 289-366-4565

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BABAK ATAEI KACHOEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHOEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011