skip to content

Glover, Benedict Martin

CPSO#: 90173

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room A-209, Schulich Heart Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804746
Fax: 4164805251 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Benedict Glover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Glover ( CPSO# 90173 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room A209
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Feb 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 09 Jan 2009 to 21 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 22 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2021
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Benedict Martin Glover may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of  Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Glover
                        holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Glover no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.