skip to content

Dias, Bryan Francis

CPSO#: 65451

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, Room C6-130
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3483
Fax: (519) 663-3499 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bryan F. Dias Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dias ( CPSO# 65451 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Tzemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dias ( CPSO# 65451 )
Dr. N. Tzemos ( CPSO# 83573 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRYAN FRANCIS DIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993