skip to content

Budisin, Branko

CPSO#: 77508

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
EXR Medical Imaging
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone: (905) 831-1800 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Campus
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Huntsville District Memorial Hosp
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: 705-789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: 705-645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1


Corporation Name: Branko Budisin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 223-6500

Business Address:
7 Metcalfe Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H3
Phone Number: (613) 392-8965

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANKO BUDISIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDISIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.