skip to content

Blew, Brian Douglas Malcolm

CPSO#: 72289

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73636
Fax: (613) 737-8938 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Blew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Blew ( CPSO# 72289 )
Dr. J. Sandoz ( CPSO# 84745 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 22
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN DOUGLAS MALCOLM BLEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.