skip to content

Armstrong, Bryan Michael

CPSO#: 68028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: (705) 457-3955 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Michael Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRYAN MICHAEL ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998