skip to content

Azuh, Victor Ijoma

CPSO#: 90322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:University of Lagos, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corp
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON  N8Y 1H7
Phone: (519) 974-8682
Fax: (519) 974-8836 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Azuh ( CPSO# 90322 )

Business Address:
Pillette Village Walk In and
Family Practice Clinic
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8Y 1H7
Phone Number: (519) 974-8682

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010 Active
             Dr.  Victor  Ijoma  Azuh may practise medicine independently in family medicine
            only, excluding emergency medicine.