skip to content

Azuelos, Ilan

CPSO#: 97416

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2012 to 08 May 2012
EL - Respirology

University Of Toronto, 18 Sep 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2019