skip to content

Azizi, Behrooz

CPSO#: 95485

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 501
31 Kingsbury Drive
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Phone: (519) 745-3690
Fax: (519) 745-4856 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Behrooz Azizi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Azizi ( CPSO# 95485 )

Business Address:
715 Fischer-Hallman Road
Suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2E 4E9
Phone Number: (519) 745-3690

Business Address:
310 Main Street East
Suite 201
Milton ON  L9T 1P5
Phone Number: (905) 693-1880

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEHROOZ AZIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016