skip to content

Azi, Adaku Michelle

CPSO#: 85300

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Igbo

Education:ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200-222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C1P6
Phone: 9054403600 Ext. 1
Fax: 9056977745 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Canada
Phone: 9055768711 Ext. 3931
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

590 Oshawa Blvd North
Oshawa ON  L1G 5T9
Canada
Phone: 9055791777 Ext. 6370
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

B3 - 795 Ottawa St S
Kitchener ON  N2E 0A5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. M. Azi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azi ( CPSO# 85300 )

Business Address:
Bomanville Medical Building
3100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 440-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAKU MICHELLE AZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008