skip to content

Azevedo, Alexandre Mello de

CPSO#: 99052

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2012 to 03 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2012