Ayub, Muhammad (CPSO#: 100143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 May 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Developmental Disabilities
Consulting Program
Ongwanada Resource Centre
191 Portmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone: (613) 549-7944
Fax: (613) 549-7387
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhammad Ayub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ayub ( CPSO# 100143)

Business Address:
Providence Care Mental Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Business Address:
Developmental Disabilities Consulting Program
Ongwanda Resource Centre
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 549-7944

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muhammad Ayub may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, Queen's University, in which Dr. Ayub holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Ayub no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note:  This certificate is issued on May 2, 2013, and expires on June 30, 2021.
            Upon  renewal of Dr. Ayub's academic appointment at Queen's University, the
            expiry datecan be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2.