skip to content

Fagbemigun, Ayokunle

CPSO#: 99963

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 09 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
09 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education: University of Lagos, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 21 Mar 2022
Summary:

The Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found Dr. Fagbemigun engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct when he billed OHIP for services he did not provide and/or was ineligible to bill, and accepted fees for referrals to a cardiac care provider. The Tribunal also found Dr. Fagbemigun failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by ordering, conducting and/or billing unnecessary tests for multiple patients, for his own financial gain, and by keeping incomplete and inaccurate patient charts.

Following a penalty hearing, the panel reserved its decision on penalty. The panel’s reasons for decision were released on June 9, 2022. The Tribunal ordered that:

  • The Registrar revoke Dr. Fagbemigun’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
  • Dr. Fagbemigun pay a fine of $35,000 to the Minister of Finance no later than July 11, 2022 and provide proof of this payment to the Registrar of the College within five days of making it;
  • Dr. Fagbemigun pay costs to the College in the amount of $72,590 no later than September 9, 2022; and
  • Dr. Fagbemigun attend before the Tribunal to be reprimanded

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motions: 2021-02-01 to 3; 2021-03-03; 2021-10-25; Merits: 2021-11-01, 3 to 5, 8; 2022-02-15; Penalty: 2022-04-20