skip to content

Aylmer, Anne Patricia

CPSO#: 32190

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Dec 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Nov 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:19 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 31 Dec 1980
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2002 to 06 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2002