skip to content

Ayesha, Qanta

CPSO#: 91308

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly St West
Suite 303
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-6422
Fax: (905) 683-6548 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

127 Lebovic Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L4V9
Canada
Phone: 4167010127
Fax: 4167019727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QANTA AYESHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYESHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 28 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)