skip to content

Ayeni, Oluwole Omodele

CPSO#: 91063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
101 & 611 - 581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 853-6644 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1500 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1T1
Canada
Phone: 705 222 6337
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H1H7
Canada
Phone: 7057892311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Omodele Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 91063 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUWOLE OMODELE AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2018