skip to content

Ayeni, Olubukunola Olasunkanmi

CPSO#: 95946

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (416) 981-8626 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P6
Canada
Phone: 6475561417
Fax: 4169818626
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Olubukunola Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 95946 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUBUKUNOLA OLASUNKANMI AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017