skip to content

Ayeni, Olawale Olugbenga

CPSO#: 96628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Red Hill Medical Group
337 Queenston Road
Ste 200
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone: (905) 549-8863
Fax: (905) 549-4706 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
50 Charlton Avenue E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Ave
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 383-0448
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

HHS/St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 777-3837
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Rd
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Canada
Phone: (905) 627-3541
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olawale Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 96628 )

Business Address:
HHS/ St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
St Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Road
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Phone Number: (905) 627-3541

Business Address:
Red hill Medical Group
200 - 337 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone Number: (905) 549-8863

Business Address:
St Peter's Residence
125 Redfern Avenue
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W9
Phone Number: (905) 383-0448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr.  Olawale  Olugbenga  Ayeni  may  practise  medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.