skip to content

Axler, Jeffrey Lee

CPSO#: 30007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
620 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 743-5551
Fax: (416) 743-7646 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 225
4600 HIghway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 650-0017
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

194 Bigwin Island
Dwight ON  P0B1A0
Canada
Phone: 416-230-0450
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Axler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Axler ( CPSO# 30007 )

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
225 - 4600 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 650-0017

Business Address:
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2656

Business Address:
620 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 743-5551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY LEE AXLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AXLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978