skip to content

Awoke, Asnake Limenhe

CPSO#: 97457

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:GONDAR COLLEGE OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 23 Jun 2012
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013