skip to content

Awan, Kokab Imtiaz Ahmad

CPSO#: 90618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Cluj, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON  N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kokab Awan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Awan ( CPSO# 90618 )

Business Address:
201 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 0W7
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KOKAB IMTIAZ AHMAD AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Jan 2014 to 26 Jan 2014
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Jan 2014 to 17 Feb 2014
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 18 Feb 2014 to 06 Mar 2014
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 May 2015 to 29 May 2015
EL - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Queen's University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018