skip to content

Awad, Sara Farouq Mohammed

CPSO#: 98352

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Sharjah, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock Street Centenary 3-008
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 3212
Fax: 613-545-2204 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sara F.M. Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Awad ( CPSO# 98352 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Centenary 3-008
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA FAROUQ MOHAMMED AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016