skip to content

Dhanoa, Avtar Singh

CPSO#: 65166

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 08 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Apr 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malay, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mysore University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Avtar Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhanoa ( CPSO# 65166 )

Business Address:
8-50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 6G9
Phone Number: (905) 455-9949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 08 Apr 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2020 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Apr 2020
Summary:

On April 6, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee 
 (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. 
 Avtar Singh Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee set 
 out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow. 

 FACTS 

 Dr. Dhanoa is a 60-year-old family physician practicing in Brampton, Ontario. He 
 obtained his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the 
 College in 1993. 
  
 April 2016 criminal charges 
  
 On April 3, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “April 2016 
 charges”): 
  
    -  Threatening death, contrary to s. 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada; 
              
    -  Having in his possession a weapon, to wit a knife, for a purpose dangerous to the 
       public peace, contrary to s. 88(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and 
              
    -  Having in his possession a prohibited weapon, to wit a knife, capable of being 
       opened by centrifugal force, contrary to s. 91(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
  
 Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the April 2016 charges to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of 
 the Health Professions Procedural Code, being Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
 Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”).  
 
Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognizance of bail, with conditions (the “April 2016 bail 
conditions”). Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his April 2016 bail conditions to the College, 
contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code. 
 
The College did not learn of the April 2016 charges, or the April 2016 bail conditions, 
until September 2018, during the College’s investigation of the December 2016 charges 
(described below), which included an allegation that he had breached his April 2016 bail 
conditions. 
  
On April 27, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2016 CPSO Annual Renewal Form. In doing 
so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the April 2016 charges. He falsely answered “No” to 
the question ,“Since April 1, 2015, have you been charged with any offence in Canada or 
elsewhere?” 
             
On January 11, 2017, the April 2016 charges were withdrawn, and Dr. Dhanoa entered 
into a peace bond under s. 810 of the Criminal Code.  
 
 December 2016 criminal charges 
  
 On December 6, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the 
 “December 2016 charges”): 
  
    -  Operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal 
       Code of Canada; 
    -  Operating a motor while having consumed alcohol in such a quantity that the 
       concentration in the person’s blood exceeds eighty milligrams of alcohol in one 
       hundred millilitres of blood contrary to s. 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of 
       Canada; and 
    -  Failing to comply with his recognizance of bail contrary to s. 145(3) of the 
       Criminal Code of Canada. 
  
 Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the December 2016 
 charges to the College until April 25, 2018.  
  
 On December 7, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognisance of bail, with 
 conditions (the “December 2016 bail conditions”), including that he not buy, possess or 
 consume alcohol. Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his December 2016 bail conditions to the 
 College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code. The College did not learn of Dr. Dhanoa’s 
December 2016 bail conditions until April 2018, during its investigation of the December 
2016 charges. On June 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2017 CPSO Annual Renewal 
Form, as attached at Tab 9 of the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability). 
In doing so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the December 2016 charges. He falsely 
answered “No” to the question, “Since April 1, 2016, have you been charged with, and/or 
found guilty of, any offences in Canada or elsewhere? (Include all offences under the 
Criminal Code of Canada, the controlled Drugs and Substances Act, the Food and Drugs 
Act, the Health Insurance Act, and/or related legislation in any province or jurisdiction. 
In addition, include any other offences related to the practice of medicine.)” 
 
On November 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, was found guilty of, operating a 
motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. 
The other two charges were withdrawn. By way of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was 
prohibited from driving for 12 months, fined $1,000, and ordered to pay a $300 victim 
surcharge. Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of 
guilt on the December 2016 offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired to the 
College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not report the finding of guilt on the offence 
of operating a motor vehicle while impaired until April 25, 2018. The offence of 
operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of 
Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his suitability to practise. 
 
August 2017 criminal charges 
 
 On August 4, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “August 
 2017 charges”): 
    -  Assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada; 
   -  Failing to comply with a recognizance of bail, contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal 
      Code of Canada; and 
   -  Failing to comply with a recognizance, contrary to s. 811 of the Criminal Code of 
      Canada. 
 
Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the August 2017 charges 
to the College in a timely manner. He did not report them to the College until April 25, 
2018.  
 
On March 26, 2018, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, was found guilty of assault, contrary to 
s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada. The other two charges were withdrawn. By way 
of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was given a conditional discharge, placed on probation for 
three (3) years, ordered to submit his DNA, and was ordered to pay a $100 victim 
surcharge.  
 
Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of guilt on the 
August 2017 charge of assault to the College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not 
disclose it to the College until April 25, 2018. The offence of assault contrary to s. 266 
of the Criminal Code of Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his 
suitability to practise. 
 
FINDING 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct 
under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which is Schedule 2 to 
the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the “Code”), in that he has 
been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and under 
paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in 
that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
  
 PENALTY AND COSTS 
  
 The Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration 
for a period of five (5) months, commencing from April 8, 2020 at 12:01 a.m. 
  
 The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and 
 limitations on Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration: 
 - Dr. Dhanoa shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”;1 
 - Dr. Dhanoa will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the 
 Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (“the PROBE program”) by receiving 
 a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Dhanoa will 
 complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will 
 provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and 
 attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. 
 -The Committee ordered Dr. Dhanoa to pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of the Order.

Hearing Date(s): April 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: May 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
(1) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 1, 2017
SENTENCE: 12 month driving prohibition; Fine of $1000; Victim surcharge of $300.

(2) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Assault, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.

DATE: March 26, 2018
SENTENCE: Conditional discharge with 3 years’ probation; Victim surcharge of $100; DNA Order.