skip to content

Aviles, Alberto Julian

CPSO#: 94798

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Illinois, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012