skip to content

Avila, Maria Laura

CPSO#: 86995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2019
EXPIRY DATE
04 Feb 2026
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Tucuman, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Peter Gilgan Centre for Research
and Learning
686 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 0A4
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:05 Feb 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 04 Feb 2026

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Maria Laura Avila may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, Division of Hematology and Oncology, University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. Avila holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Avila no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Avila's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Avila's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  February  5, 2019.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 4, 2026.