skip to content

Aversa, Meghan Mae

CPSO#: 95577

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Toronto General Hospital
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGHAN MAE AVERSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVERSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2020