skip to content

Averns, Henry Lloyd

CPSO#: 85851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1528 Sydenham Road
Kingston ON  K7L 4V4
Phone: (613) 507-7878 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Averns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Averns ( CPSO# 85851 )

Business Address:
1528 Sydenham Rd
Kingston ON  K7L 4V4
Phone Number: 623 507 7878

Business Address:
Quarry Medical Building
Suite 301
190 Wellington Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3E4
Phone Number: (613) 507-7878


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2013 Active
             Dr. Henry Lloyd Averns may practise medicine independently in rheumatology,
            only.