Avelino, Tara Mae Jessica De Guzman (CPSO#: 101228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the Philippines, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew ON  K7V 0C3
Phone: (613) 432-2222
Fax: (613) 433-3838
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

499 Raglan St North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avelino De Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Avelino ( CPSO# 101228)
Dr. A. De Jesus ( CPSO# 104983)

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
100 Health Village Lane
Renfrew ON  K7V 0C3
Phone Number: (613) 432-2222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA MAE JESSICA DE GUZMAN AVELINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVELINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015