skip to content

Avanessy-Monachakanian, Aida

CPSO#: 98045

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1939 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 298-9851
Fax: (416) 298-3160 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aida Avanessy-Monachakanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Avanessy-Monachakanian ( CPSO# 98045 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 298-1494

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AIDA AVANESSY-MONACHAKANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVANESSY-MONACHAKANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014