skip to content

Austin, Michael Arthur

CPSO#: 93761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tasmania, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Austin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Austin ( CPSO# 93761 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ARTHUR AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015