skip to content

Aulakh, Lakyntiew Patsha Syiemlieh

CPSO#: 85662

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dibrugarh University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: (705) 671-3031 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Syiemlieh Aulakh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Aulakh ( CPSO# 85662 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2010 Active
             Dr.  Lakyntiew  Patsha  Syiemlieh Aulakh may practise medicine independently in
            Psychiatry, only.