skip to content

Aulakh, Amandev Kaur

CPSO#: 95555

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pivot Sport Medicine & Orthopaedics
2288 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N9
Phone: (416) 767-4868
Fax: (416) 763-2577 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit D
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-2174
Fax: (905) 842-8071
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Unit D
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-2174
Fax: (905) 842-8071
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDEV KAUR AULAKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AULAKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014