skip to content

Aul, Ritu Bhavreet

CPSO#: 90089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NSM Regional Genetics Program
170 Colbourne St. West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-327-9154
Fax: 705-325-9459 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Simcoe Muskoka Regional Genet
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: 705-325-2201
Fax: 705-325-9459
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health
B-wing, Level 2
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 7579
Fax: 905-883-2052
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics and Genomics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RITU BHAVREET AUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jan 2009
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010