skip to content

Auguste, Bourne Lewis Adrian

CPSO#: 97551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 370
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 5590
Fax: 416-480-5180 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bourne Auguste Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Auguste ( CPSO# 97551 )

Business Address:
370 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 480-5590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BOURNE LEWIS ADRIAN AUGUSTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016