skip to content

Auger, Dominique

CPSO#: 66733

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Francophone de Toronto
303-555 Richmond St West
Toronto,ON
M5V 3B1
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: 4169222672 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

245 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4P3B7
Canada
Phone: 416-488-1455
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Auger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Auger ( CPSO# 66733 )

Business Address:
P.O. Box 112
303 - 555 Richmond Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 922-2672

Business Address:
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Business Address:
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997