skip to content

Aubin, Jean-Michel Robert

CPSO#: 93541

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 225-8433
Fax: (613) 225-3652 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

6265 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A2Z0
Canada
Phone: 613-838-1223
Fax: 613-838-2152
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. JM Aubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aubin ( CPSO# 93541 )

Business Address:
Suite 170
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 225-8433

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
6265 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone Number: (613) 838-1223


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-MICHEL ROBERT AUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2016