skip to content

Au, Anthony Soot-Wang

CPSO#: 22813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Sydney, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anthony S. Au Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Au's medical records remain with: Trillium Health Centre Health Records Department 100 Queensway West Mississauga, ON L5B 1B8 Tel: (905) 848-7100
Date Received: 24 Aug 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:14 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012