skip to content

Atwal, Gulshandeep Singh

CPSO#: 90149

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian, Urdu

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON  M3M 0B2 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Alliston Diagnositic Centre
117 Young St.
#21
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-0074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

535 MULOCK DR
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: 905-9539044
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Atwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Atwal ( CPSO# 90149 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GULSHANDEEP SINGH ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011