skip to content

Atuegwu, Chinelo Onyinye

CPSO#: 101289

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 04 Jul 2016 to 15 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 16 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017